TRUST PROPERTY HELD ICW THE VILLAGE HALL (GREAT TEY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE EDUCATION AND ENTERTAINMENT OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 29 September 1971: Standard registration
- 26 November 2017: Funds received from 262989 THE VILLAGE HALL
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
carol hill | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tim Frances | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Warnes | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Robert Aubrey Frost | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Great Tey Parish Council | Trustee | 09 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robin John Bartleet | Trustee | 09 August 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.91k | £19.42k | £13.44k | £24.06k | £26.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.47k | £16.49k | £16.50k | £18.85k | £30.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £342 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 March 2021 | 151 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 29 OCT 1925 AS AMENDED ON 11 SEP 1972 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 15 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED ON 09 AUG 2016
Charitable objects
THE INCOME ARISING FROM THE LAND TO BE APPLIED TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE OF THE VILLAGE HALL OR TO SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS THE PARISH COUNCIL MAY THINK FIT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GREAT TEY AND TO PROVIDE AND TO MAINTAIN A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF GREAT TEY (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. THE SAID LAND WITH THE BUILDING THEREON SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
GREAT TEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Great Tey Village Hall
Chappel Road
Great Tey
Colchester
Essex
co6 1jq
- Phone:
- 07713791871
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window