Financial history EPWORTH CHOIR

Charity number: 263007
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/08/2017 28/08/2018 28/08/2019 28/08/2020 28/08/2021
Total gross income £79.08k £60.42k £38.95k £25.74k £7.75k
Total expenditure £24.37k £32.98k £45.31k £21.87k £10.67k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A