Accounts and annual returns BRAILLE CHESS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 263049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 17 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 17 May 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 11 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 11 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 11 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 13 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 13 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 06 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 06 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window