Trustees BRAILLE CHESS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 263049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WILLIAM GEORGE ARMSTRONG Chair 15 March 2023
MARY BISHOP PRIZE FUND
Received: On time
Abi Emma Sian Baker Trustee 26 March 2022
None on record
Mark Hague Trustee 18 March 2017
None on record
Julie Ann Leonard Trustee 08 March 2014
None on record
Voldi Gailans Trustee 08 March 2014
None on record
MRS GILL SMITH Trustee 07 March 2009
None on record
MR GUY WHITEHOUSE Trustee 03 March 2007
None on record
MARK KIRKHAM Trustee 20 March 2004
None on record