Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF CHARING CROSS HOSPITAL

Charity number: 263055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 20 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 20 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 08 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 08 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 19 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 19 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 21 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 21 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 11 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 11 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window