Financial history THE FRIENDS OF CHARING CROSS HOSPITAL

Charity number: 263055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £121.29k £93.96k £98.76k £117.05k £54.61k
Total expenditure £90.32k £119.00k £97.66k £89.34k £36.61k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £5.62k