THE INSTITUTE OF RACE RELATIONS RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports the research and development work of The Institute of race Relations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 November 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Bourne | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
ELIZABETH FEKETE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
COLIN PRESCOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Lee Bridges | Trustee |
|
||||||||
FRANCES WEBBER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23 | £411 | £200 | £239 | £279 | |
|
Total expenditure | £354 | £426 | £372 | £408 | £426 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 November 2023 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8TH SEPTEMBER 1971
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE INSTITUTE OF RACE RELATIONS AND WITHIN THE TERMS OF THE OBJECTS OF ASSOCIATION OF THE INSTIUTE FROM TIME TO TIME IN FORCE; SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE FOUNDATIONS EITHER IN GREAT BRITAIN OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD WHETHER OR NOT CONNECTED WITH THE INSTITUTE AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Institute of Race Relations
The Grayston Centre
28 Charles Square
LONDON
N1 6HT
- Phone:
- 02078370041
- Email:
- info@irr.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window