THE GENERAL CHURCH OF THE NEW JERUSALEM COUNCIL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support the activities of the General Church of The New Jerusalem (and its members) in the furtherance of its objects - to present, teach and maintain the doctrines of The New Jerusalem Church as contained in the writings of Emmanuel Swedenborg.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 November 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Erik James Buss | Chair | 10 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Grant Hugo Odhner | Trustee | 10 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gweirydd Rhys Williams | Trustee | 19 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Hilda Costello | Trustee | 14 January 2013 |
|
|||||
ANITA JOY LEECH | Trustee | 14 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
DALE MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK BURNISTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFFREY GRAHAM WYNCOLL | Trustee |
|
||||||
STEPHEN ELPHICK | Trustee |
|
||||||
NATHAN JAMES MORLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW RICHARD BRUELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev FREDERICK CHARLES ELPHICK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.38k | £202.97k | £58.65k | £58.15k | £63.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.36k | £199.10k | £64.82k | £56.10k | £54.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9TH SEPTEMBER 1971 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12 MARCH 1995 as amended on 07 Jun 2021 as amended on 05 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
TO PRESENT, TEACH AND MAINTAIN THE DOCTRINES OF THE NEW JERUSALEM CHURCH AS CONTAINED IN THE THEOLOGICAL WRITINGS OF EMANUEL SWEDENBORG.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 PUMBRO
STONESFIELD
WITNEY
OX29 8QF
- Phone:
- 01993891700
- Email:
- mrkburniston@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window