Financial history THE MASONS COMPANY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 263137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £36.91k £40.01k £44.05k £43.98k £45.98k
Total expenditure £34.99k £11.53k £40.54k £33.71k £44.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A