Trustees THE MASONS COMPANY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 263137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip William Hynard Chair 22 March 2021
None on record
Martin Paul Joseph Low Trustee 05 July 2022
THE ST JAMES'S CONSERVATION TRUST LTD.
Received: On time
Helen Kate Weir Pryke Trustee 05 July 2022
None on record
Ryan Andrew Williams Trustee 22 March 2021
None on record
DOUGLAS WILLIAM NEILL Trustee 10 October 2019
THE SHAKESPEAR CHARITY FUND
Received: On time
Rt Rev Jonathan Mark Richard Baker Trustee 26 March 2019
THE SOCIETY OF ST STEPHEN'S HOUSE
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
PARISH ESTATES CHARITY
Received: On time
BROMFIELD'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
FORWARD IN FAITH
Received: On time
ASCOT PRIORY
Received: On time
ST ANDREW HOLBORN AND STAFFORD'S CHARITY
Received: On time
ST ANDREW HOLBORN CHURCH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
STAFFORD'S CHARITY
Received: On time
LADY ELIZABETH HATTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Craig Douglas Bryce Trustee 26 March 2019
None on record
Mark Eugene Macdonald Trustee 09 October 2018
None on record
William Joshua Gloyn Trustee 04 October 2016
None on record