Financial history COMMONWEALTH PARLIAMENTARY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 263147
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.57m £2.68m £2.84m £2.64m £2.61m
Total expenditure £3.06m £2.35m £3.58m £1.55m £1.83m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.41m £2.48m £2.59m £2.44m £2.47m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £152.99k £201.78k £244.33k £196.69k £140.85k
Income - Other £6.26k £3.16k £243 £329 £1.58k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.01m £2.30m £3.53m £1.50m £1.78m
Expenditure - Raising funds £47.27k £48.71k £51.67k £49.73k £52.76k
Expenditure - Governance £622.67k £692.47k £629.02k £128.11k £38.21k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £47.27k £48.71k £51.67k £49.73k £52.76k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0