Trustees COMMONWEALTH PARLIAMENTARY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 263147
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
34 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Uday Pratap Singh Hon | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Noraini Ahmad Hon | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Naiqama Lalabalavu Hon. | Trustee | 29 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Mason-Cox Hon. | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ted Arnott Hon. | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Law Choo Kiang Hon. | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Lines Hon | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Sikelela Chatima Nkhata Hon. | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark David Shelton Hon. | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Terry Duguid Hon. | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zainab Gimba Hon. | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alban Sumana Kingsford Bagbin Hon. | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Solomon Lechesa Tsenoli Hon. | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Kanushu Hon | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kazi Nabil Ahmed Hon. | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ritu Khanduri Bhusham Hon. | Trustee | 09 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Randall Weekes | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claudius J Francis | Trustee | 17 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shri Biswajit Daimary | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Burton | Trustee | 05 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joy Birch | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Therese Naru Kaetavara Hon. | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gerry Brownlee Hon | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mahinda Yapa Abeywardana | Trustee | 15 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Arthur Holder | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lim Biow Chuan | Trustee | 17 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hon Ian Liddell-Grainger MP | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hon Osei Kyei Mensah Bonsu MP | Trustee | 28 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rt Hon Dr Abbas Chernor Bundu MP | Trustee | 28 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hon Anurag Sharma MP | Trustee | 28 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hon Leona Roberts MLA | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
HON DR MAKALI MULU MP | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
HON DR LAL CHAND UKRANI MP | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
HON STUART McMILLAN MSP | Trustee | 16 December 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.