BRITISH WATERFOWL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes the conservation and preservation of all species of waterfowl and strives to educate through attendance at educational activities and other public events. This includes the education of the public via social media about some of the myths regarding the welfare of waterfowl. Producing academic studies such as looking into the genetic purity of endangered species of waterfowl.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Canada
- Croatia
- Falkland Islands
- France
- Germany
- Guernsey
- Hong Kong
- Ireland
- Jersey
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Portugal
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 03 May 1972: Standard registration
- B W A (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracey Eden | Trustee | 24 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Hardcastle | Trustee | 25 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Luke Millward | Trustee | 26 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Giles | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Rubery | Trustee | 29 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
IVOR PARRISH | Trustee | 27 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD HEDGES | Trustee | 27 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Owain Llyr Davies | Trustee | 01 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS DAVIS | Trustee | 11 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
BRIDGET BURMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFFREY CHASE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.93k | £29.55k | £21.67k | £26.32k | £20.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.87k | £32.54k | £23.23k | £27.72k | £22.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 August 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 23 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AS AMENDED 31ST JANUARY 1973 AS AMENDED 16 JANUARY 2010.
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE STUDY AND CONSERVATION OF WATERFOWL, AND 2. CARRY OUT RESEARCH AND UNDERTAKE ACTIVITIES TO PROMOTE KNOWLEDGE AND INTEREST IN WATERFOWL AND 3. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC TO THE GREATER APPRECIATION OF WATERFOWL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLME HOUSE
THE DALE
AINSTABLE
CARLISLE
CA4 9RH
- Phone:
- 07514601167
- Email:
- secretary@waterfowl.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window