Financial history PENZANCE AND WEST PENWITH OLD PEOPLES WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 263223
Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £190.15k £200.84k £222.70k £248.86k £304.27k
Total expenditure £191.24k £203.16k £222.80k £251.20k £261.01k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £47.63k £64.65k £56.44k
Income from government grants £12.00k £12.00k £16.00k N/A £36.53k