Trustees THE BURY ST EDMUNDS SOCIETY

Charity number: 263230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Terence John O'Donoghue Trustee 10 June 2019
None on record
Sarah Jane Nunn Trustee 13 November 2017
None on record
Russell Ian Cook Trustee 25 May 2017
None on record
Robin Nigel Richmond Burnett Trustee 11 July 2016
None on record
Kerr Clement Trustee 26 May 2016
None on record
DOUGLAS BEARDON Trustee 14 March 2016
THE BURY ST EDMUNDS SOCIETY CIO
Recently registered
PATRICK CHUNG Trustee 28 May 2015
EAST OF ENGLAND ASBESTOS PATIENT SUPPORT GROUP
Recently registered
THE BURY ST EDMUNDS SOCIETY CIO
Recently registered
SUSAN SAVAGE Trustee 28 May 2015
None on record
TIMOTHY RICHARD PAGE Trustee 25 August 2011
None on record
Roderick Rees Trustee 22 August 2011
None on record
MARTYN TAYLOR Trustee
None on record