CONSOLATA MISSIONARY SISTERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Members of the congregation work in parishes, charity organisations and prisons. They assist the homeless, the elderly, the disabled and visit them to assess family situations and provide religious and material assistance when needed. Members of the congregation also visit local parishes to talk about their work in the foreign missions and the needs of the missions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 November 1971: Standard registration
- 20 February 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.03k | £92.78k | £37.67k | £38.56k | £27.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.23k | £739.15k | £29.02k | £49.89k | £47.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 01 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 01 September 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 09 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 09 October 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 27 June 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 27 June 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20TH OCTOBER 1971
Charitable objects
CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK FOR THE TIME BEING CARRIED ON BY OR UNDER THE DIRECTION OF THE SOCIETY AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE SUPERIOR SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIR AND IF AT ANY TIME THE SOCIETY SHALL CEASE TO EXIST OR SHALLCEASE TO CARRY ON OR DIRECT ANY CHARITABLE WORK THEN FOR SUCH LAWFUL CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window