Accounts and annual returns G & M WILSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 263432
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 22 February 2022 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 14 February 2020 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 25 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 22 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required