Financial history G & M WILSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 263432
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £29 £21 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £14.49k £1.13k £629 £629 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A