PICKFORD TRUST

Charity number: 263529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 15 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 04 March 2021 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 04 March 2021 27 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 05 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 05 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 21 August 2019 197 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 21 August 2019 197 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 16 March 2018 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required