GANZONI CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 263583
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 15 February 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 15 February 2021 10 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 19 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 19 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 21 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 21 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 17 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 17 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 17 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 17 October 2016 On time Download