Accounts and annual returns THE SZEBEN/PETO FOUNDATION

Charity number: 263950
Charity reporting is overdue by 131 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 131 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 131 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 26 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 03 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 02 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 04 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required