Financial history THE SZEBEN/PETO FOUNDATION

Charity number: 263950
Charity reporting is overdue by 132 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £13.37k £13.49k £12.30k £9.35k £8.81k
Total expenditure £17.83k £17.06k £15.15k £14.10k £11.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A