THE VEDIC SOCIETY OF SOUTHAMPTON

Charity number: 263969
Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 99 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 99 days
Annual return 31 October 2019 13 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 13 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 21 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 06 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 06 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 16 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 16 July 2017 On time Download