THE VEDIC SOCIETY OF SOUTHAMPTON

Charity number: 263969
Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019
Total gross income £100.94k £100.82k £104.42k £111.56k £106.74k
Total expenditure £63.53k £76.60k £82.28k £107.51k £83.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A