THE VEDIC SOCIETY OF SOUTHAMPTON

Charity number: 263969
Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PRAVIN PATEL Trustee 01 April 2014 None on record
RAVINDRA PARMAR Chair 11 March 2014
SOUTHAMPTON COUNCIL OF FAITHS Received: On time
MANSUKH PIPALIA Trustee None on record
Meten Kishore Lakhani Trustee 23 March 2018 None on record
AVINAS R PATEL Trustee None on record
JALDIP PATEL Trustee 01 April 2014 None on record
Jignesh Patel Trustee 29 March 2019 None on record
Sanjay Chandarana Trustee 29 March 2019 None on record
Sarika Chandarana Trustee 29 March 2019 None on record
Vimal Patel Trustee 29 March 2019 None on record
Nikhil Chikhal Trustee 17 April 2016 None on record
Latha Davda Trustee 29 March 2019 None on record
SANJAY DAVDA Trustee 23 March 2018 None on record
Nikhyta Patel Trustee 23 March 2018 None on record