Accounts and annual returns PHILIP KING CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 263992
Charity reporting is up to date (32 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 03 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 09 March 2022 32 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 01 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 17 March 2021 40 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 01 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 16 March 2018 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 01 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window