Financial history THE GLASTONBURY CONSERVATION SOCIETY

Charity number: 264036
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £1.40k £70.97k £29.91k £13.80k £2.89k
Total expenditure £979 £10.56k £15.33k £1.14k £3.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A