THE MODERN LAW REVIEW LIMITED

Charity number: 264072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

22 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jeremy Christian Nicholas Horder Trustee 12 February 2020 None on record
Professor Karen Yeung Trustee 17 June 2020 None on record
Professor Michael Lobban Trustee 04 February 2015 None on record
Dr Jacobus Adriaan Bomhoff Trustee 04 May 2016 None on record
Dr Orla Marie Lynskey Trustee 04 May 2016 None on record
PROFESSOR ANDREW LANG Trustee None on record
DR Virginia Mantouvalou Trustee 04 February 2015
KALAYAAN Received: On time
THE EQUAL RIGHTS TRUST Received: On time
PROFESSOR CONOR GEARTY Trustee
THE BRITISH ACADEMY FOR THE PROMOTION OF HISTORICAL PHILOSOPHICAL AND PHILOLOGICAL STUDIES Received: On time
Dr Tatiana Rebecca Sara Cutts Trustee 10 December 2018 None on record
PROFESSOR DONAL NOLAN Trustee 04 May 2016
WORCESTER COLLEGE, OXFORD Received: On time
Sarah Paterson Trustee 17 December 2019 None on record
Dr Gregoire Webber Trustee 04 June 2013 None on record
Dr Kate Greasley Trustee 10 December 2018
PRINCIPAL FELLOWS AND SCHOLARS OF HERTFORD COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD Received: 9 days late
DR Dev Saif Gangjee Trustee 12 June 2012
ST HILDA'S COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD Received: On time
Professor Paul Roberts Trustee 04 May 2016 None on record
Dr Joanne Pamela Braithwaite Trustee 04 June 2013 None on record
PROFESSOR THOMAS MATTHEW POOLE Trustee None on record
PROFESSOR ROBERT DAVID KERSHAW Chair None on record
Dr Emmanuel Voyiakis Trustee 10 December 2018 None on record
Professor Vanessa Eveline Munro Trustee 10 December 2018 None on record
Sangeeta Shah Trustee 10 December 2018 None on record
Professor Tanya Aplin Trustee 04 February 2015 None on record