Accounts and annual returns THE HAROLD HYAM WINGATE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 264114
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 27 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 23 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 23 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 29 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 26 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 26 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 19 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 26 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window