Trustees THE FRIENDS OF GUY'S AND ST THOMAS' HOSPITAL

Charity number: 264150
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROFESSOR MICHAEL JOHN GLEESON Chair 24 July 2014
THE HUME KENDALL EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE BERNICE BIBBY RESEARCH TRUST
Received: On time
THE HUNTERIAN SOCIETY
Received: On time
GILLIAN MARY MOORE Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Fiona Nimmo Trustee 06 September 2023
None on record
Margaret Stewart Trustee 06 September 2023
None on record
Manmohan Lal Sharma Trustee 07 December 2020
None on record
NATALIE PRUDENCE TIDDY Trustee 30 September 2016
None on record
Dr Sheila Rankin Trustee 30 September 2016
None on record
RICHARD JACKSON BEARDON Trustee 30 September 2016
None on record
SUSAN NICOLA COOKSEY Trustee 30 September 2016
None on record
PAULA YOUNG Trustee 30 September 2016
None on record
WILLIAM GOSCOMBE JOHN EDWARDS Trustee 06 May 2016
None on record
Professor Frances Anne Flinter Trustee 04 May 2016
ALPORT UK
Overdue by 21 days
THE EUROPEAN DOCTORS ORCHESTRA
Overdue by 22 days
THE D'OYLY CARTE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
RT HON SIR SIMON HUGHES Trustee 04 May 2016
MILLWALL COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
ANN WHITEHORN Trustee 04 May 2016
None on record
Natalie Harman Trustee 04 May 2016
None on record
Mrs Chan Mayor Trustee 01 January 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CYPRIAN CLARENCE GATE
Received: On time
LAURA ELIZABETH BYERS Trustee 18 June 2013
None on record
Professor Stephen James Challacombe Trustee
THE FRUITERERS' FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE HUME KENDALL EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
Dr MICHAEL DERMOD O'BRIEN MD, FRCP Trustee
MEDICAL ARTISTS EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
THE D'OYLY CARTE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time