Accounts and annual returns L'ARCHE

Charity number: 264166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 21 May 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 21 May 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 19 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 19 May 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 26 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 26 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 28 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 29 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 29 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window