THE FRIENDS OF ANDOVER WAR MEMORAIL HOSPITAL AND HEALTH CENTRES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise monies to relieve patients and former patients of Andover War Memorial Hospital and Healthcare centres and other invalids in the community who are sick, convalescent, disabled or infirm and generally to support the charitable works of the Hospital and Healthcare centres
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
Governance
- 14 August 1972: Standard registration
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE ANDOVER HOSPITALS (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Henrietta Mason | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Daniel Benton | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
MARIA DOLORES NEAL | Trustee | 18 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.08k | £80 | £732 | £45 | £30 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £8.97k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 February 2024 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 SEPTEMBER 1971 AS AMENDED 19 NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE ANDOVER WAR MEMORIAL HOSPITAL AND HEALTH CARE CENTRES WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE HOSPITAL AND HEALTH CARE CENTRES.
Area of benefit
ANDOVER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hampshire Medical Fund
Aldermaston Road
BASINGSTOKE
Hampshire
RG24 9NA
- Phone:
- 01256314759
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window