Young Music Makers London Limited

Charity number: 264274
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alison Chandler Chair 28 April 2018 None on record
Roger Gordon Trustee 01 March 2019 None on record
Severine Philardeau Trustee 13 May 2017 None on record
Anne Greenwood Trustee 27 March 2021 None on record
Edward Bolton Trustee 27 March 2021 None on record
Koullis Kyriacou Trustee 01 October 2013 None on record
Afua Nkansah-Asamoah Trustee 28 September 2021 None on record
Virginia Kerridge Trustee 27 March 2021
FRIENDS OF HIGHGATE LIBRARY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION Received: On time
Diane Debiais Trustee 27 March 2021 None on record