THE ONSLOW NEIGHBOURHOOD ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 264296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.46k £7.25k £6.52k £7.42k £4.56k
Total expenditure £2.67k £4.52k £3.97k £5.53k £13.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A