THE MARY MARTIN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 264313
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 April 2021 156 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 April 2021 522 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 August 2019 279 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 09 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required