DAVID JOHN COHEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 264318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 05 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 17 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 12 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 22 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 19 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required