Accounts and annual returns SOMERSET ACCIDENT VOLUNTARY EMERGENCY SERVICE (SAVES)

Charity number: 264354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 29 October 2019 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 06 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 02 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required