Financial history SOMERSET ACCIDENT VOLUNTARY EMERGENCY SERVICE (SAVES)

Charity number: 264354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £9.10k £4.25k £12.53k £38.76k £27.40k
Total expenditure £6.37k £4.55k £6.78k £13.73k £9.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £26.00k £26.00k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A