BRIGHTON AND SUSSEX MEDICO-CHIRURGICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 264357
Charity reporting is overdue by 304 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 304 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 304 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 February 2020 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required