BRIGHTON AND SUSSEX MEDICO-CHIRURGICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 264357
Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £12.73k £7.59k £14.94k £14.67k £19.41k
Total expenditure £10.06k £10.06k £7.89k £15.91k £20.81k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A