MIDHURST AND DISTRICT OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Refreshments for over 60's
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 13 September 1972: Standard registration
- OVER 60'S CENTRE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Gibson | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Gibson | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Wakeford | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Morna Phillips | Trustee | 10 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Wakeford | Trustee | 15 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.61k | £0 | £2.13k | £2.76k | £2.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.43k | £1.36k | £1.30k | £1.27k | £1.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 May 2024 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 March 2022 | 403 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH JULY 1960
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST THE GENERAL GOOD OF ALL OLD PEOPLE IN THE MIDHURST RURAL DISTRICT BY ASSISTING THE WORK OF STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATION IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION, DEVELOPING PHYSICAL IMPROVEMENT, FURTHERING HEALTH, RELIEVING POVERTY, DISTRESS OR SICKNESS OR IN PURSUING ANY OBJECTS WHICH NOW ARE OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
MIDHURST RURAL DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE PAVILION
NORTH STREET
MIDHURST
WEST SUSSEX
GU29 9SB
- Phone:
- 01730816659
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window