THE ALFRED AND FRANCES RUBENS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 264430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £25.63k £20.94k £30.21k £24.81k £24.97k
Total expenditure £25.24k £35.12k £26.73k £27.10k £28.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A