THE HIGH WYCOMBE CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 264434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 June 2020 03 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 June 2019 03 September 2020 155 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 June 2018 04 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 June 2017 27 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 22 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required