Accounts and annual returns PARISH LANDS ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY

Charity number: 264490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 December 2021 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 November 2020 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required