Financial history PARISH LANDS ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY

Charity number: 264490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £7.55k £8.18k £8.55k £4.12k £12.43k
Total expenditure £2.22k £3.19k £3.22k £32.46k £2.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A