THE EALING COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 264499
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 February 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 January 2020 351 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required