PHYLLIS TUCKWELL MEMORIAL HOSPICE LTD

Charity number: 264501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HELEN ATKINSON Trustee 30 November 2020 None on record
Elizabeth Jane Wells Trustee 30 November 2020 None on record
RICHARD HUNT Trustee 23 May 2019
CYSTIC FIBROSIS TRUST Received: On time
Anne Whelan Trustee 02 November 2017
TED ADAMS TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
Dr DAVID EYRE-BROOK Chair 10 November 2011 None on record
Professor Michael Bailey Trustee 06 November 2014 None on record
Dr Robert LAING Trustee 30 November 2020 None on record
Kenneth Ratcliff Trustee 02 March 2017 None on record
VERONICA CARTER Trustee 05 November 2012
THE SHELL PENSIONERS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION
Helen Franklin Trustee 06 November 2014 None on record
ROSY Anand Trustee 03 November 2016 None on record
Alison Jane HUGGETT Trustee 23 May 2019 None on record