BISHOP'S STORTFORD CIVIC FEDERATION

Charity number: 264557
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Representing Bishop's Stortford residents and individual/corporate members in matters affecting the town as a whole, and in particular relating to planning, transport and the environment.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £918
Total expenditure: £1,028

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 September 1972: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BISHOP'S STORTFORD CIVIC SOCIETY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Dean Chair 19 April 2016
None on record
Anthony Pook Trustee 04 May 2022
AGE CONCERN BISHOP'S STORTFORD
Received: On time
Colin Arnott Trustee 26 September 2018
None on record
JOHN ANDREW RHODES Trustee 19 November 2014
None on record
MARIE CATHERINE RHODES Trustee 03 April 2014
None on record
JAMES GRAINGER Trustee 03 November 2013
None on record
DEBORAH MUNRO Trustee 20 August 2011
None on record
JILL WADE Trustee
None on record
ALYSON BAILEY Trustee
None on record
ANTHEA WYATT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.22k £1.93k £1.30k £1.19k £918
Total expenditure £704 £2.78k £661 £1.69k £1.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 06 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
125 RYE STREET
BISHOP'S STORTFORD
CM23 2HD
Phone:
01279659960