TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH NORTH EAST LONDON GOSPEL MISSION

Charity number: 264570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £46.08k £42.45k £43.72k £36.14k £41.88k
Total expenditure £45.64k £34.66k £44.74k £35.05k £43.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A