THE TREVOR CHINN CHARITABLE TRUST NO 2

Charity number: 264614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 05 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 05 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 01 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 01 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 08 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 08 August 2016 On time Download